MS HB435 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-18 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-18 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-61-10, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Public Records Act To Clarify That Public Access To A Public Record Will Not Be Diminished Because Components Of Data Are Stored In A Certain Manner; To Amend Section 25-61-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Staff Time Or Contractual Services Included In Actual Cost Of Providing Records Shall Be At The Pay Scale Of The Lowest Level Employee Or Contractor Competent To Respond To The Request; To Amend Section 25-61-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Civil Penalty Against Any Person Who Charges An Unreasonable Fee For Providing A Public Record; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public records; access not diminished because stored in certain manner and revise civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House Failed (Y: 63 N: 49 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Died On Calendar |
2013-02-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Turner, Crawford) |
2013-02-13 | House | Failed |
2013-02-13 | House | Amended |
2013-02-12 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To S.C. Accountblty/Efficiency/Transparency |