MS HB434 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-103-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Percentage Limitation On Legislative Appropriations From The State General Fund For Fiscal Year 2016; To Amend Sections 27-103-125 And 27-103-139, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provision; To Direct The State Fiscal Officer To Transfer Sums From Certain Funds In The State Treasury To The Capital Expense Fund During Fiscal Year 2015; To Direct The State Fiscal Officer To Transfer Three Million Dollars From The Mississippi Surplus Lines Association To The Mississippi Department Of Insurance Rural Fire Truck Acquisition Fund And/or The Supplemental Rural Fire Truck Fund; To Amend Section 1, Chapter 86, Laws Of 2014, To Reduce The Amounts Appropriated From The State General Fund For Certain Legislative Expenses In The Fiscal Year 2015 Appropriation; To Amend Sections 1 And 5, Chapter 6, Laws Of 2014, To Reduce The Amounts Appropriated From The State General Fund For Debt Service And Bank Service Charges In The Fiscal Year 2015 Appropriation; To Amend Section 27-103-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Funds Appropriated From The Working Cash-stabilization Reserve Fund That Are Unexpended At The End Of A Fiscal Year Shall Lapse Into The Working Cash-stabilization Reserve Fund; To Amend Section 27-103-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Funds Appropriated From The Budget Contingency Fund That Are Unexpended At The End Of A Fiscal Year Shall Lapse Into The Budget Contingency Fund; To Amend Section 27-103-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Funds Appropriated From The Capital Expense Fund That Are Unexpended At The End Of A Fiscal Year Shall Lapse Into The Capital Expense Fund; To Amend Section 37-61-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Funds Appropriated From The Education Enhancement Fund That Are Unexpended At The End Of A Fiscal Year Shall Lapse Into The Education Enhancement Fund; To Amend Section 41-113-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Funds Appropriated From The Tobacco Control Program Fund That Are Unexpended At The End Of A Fiscal Year Shall Lapse Into The Tobacco Control Program Fund; To Amend Section 43-13-407, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Funds Appropriated From The Health Care Expendable Fund That Are Unexpended At The End Of A Fiscal Year Shall Lapse Into The Health Care Expendable Fund; To Direct The State Fiscal Officer To Transfer The Entire Balance In The Health Care Trust Fund To The Health Care Expendable Fund During Fiscal Year 2015; To Amend Section 27-103-213, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete Certain Language That Was Applicable To The Distribution Of The Unencumbered General Fund Cash Balance At The Close Of Fiscal Year 2014; To Amend Section 65-37-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delay The Requirement For Appropriations To The Local System Bridge Replacement And Rehabilitation Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State budget; revise authority for expenditures from General Fund and provide for certain transfers to rainy day fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-31 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-31 | House | Reconsidered |
2015-03-31 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Frierson, Huddleston (15th)) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Burton,Hopson |
2015-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Moore |
2015-03-11 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2015-01-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-01-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-01-28 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-01-28 | House | Amended |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-27 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Appropriations |