MS HB429 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-19-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Persons Eighteen Years Of Age Or Older To Enter Into Binding Contractual Relationships For The Purpose Of Investing In Mutual Funds; To Bring Forward Section 1-3-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Defines The Term "minor", For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 1-3-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Defines The Term "personal Property", For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Contracts; authorize persons eighteen years of age or older to enter into for the purpose of investing in mutual funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
2021-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-11 | House | Amended |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the Third Time |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 3 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 3 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
93 | 19 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |