MS HB429 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-15-26, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Successful Completion Of Workforce Training At A Community College Or Workforce Development Center As A Condition Of The Court Withholding Acceptance Of A Person's Plea And Sentence Under The Nonadjudication Provisions Of This Section; To Amend Section 99-15-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Successful Completion Of Workforce Training At A Community College Or Workforce Development Center As A Term Of The Pretrial Intervention Program Under This Section; To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration To Transfer From The Budget Of The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To The Mississippi Community College Board The Sum Of $2,000.00 For Each Person Who Successfully Completes Workforce Training At A Community College Or Workforce Development Center As A Condition Of The Court Withholding Acceptance Of The Person's Plea And Sentence Under Section 99-15-26 Or As A Term Of The Pretrial Intervention Program Under Section 99-15-117, Which Shall Be Disbursed To The Community College At Which The Person Received The Workforce Training Or The Community College Affiliated With The Workforce Development Center At Which The Person Received The Workforce Training; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Nonadjudication and pretrial intervention; authorize completion of workforce training as a condition that the court may impose.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |