MS HB424 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact Into Law The Audiology And Speech-language Pathology Interstate Compact And Provide That The State Of Mississippi Enters The Compact With Other States That Join In The Compact; To Amend Sections 73-38-3, 73-38-5, 73-38-7, 73-38-9, 73-38-17, 73-38-25, 73-38-27, 73-38-29 And 73-38-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; To Bring Forward Sections 73-38-33 And 73-38-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Audiology and speech-language pathology interstate compact; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Mims [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-15 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2022-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 38 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 38 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 38 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 38 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 38 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 38 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 38 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 38 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 38 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 38 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 38 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |