MS HB420 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-21-605, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Juvenile Offenders May Be Sentenced To The Intensive Supervision Program Administered By The Department Of Human Services; To Provide That The Minimum Sentence Under This Program Shall Be Six Months For Juvenile Offenders; To Require Juvenile Offenders To Pay $10.00 For The Test; To Amend Section 47-5-1003, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Juvenile Offenders To Participate In The Intensive Supervision Program; To Amend Section 47-5-1007, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Juvenile Offenders To Pay A Monthly Fee For Participation In Such Program; To Amend Section 47-5-1013, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Intensive supervision program; expand to include juvenile delinquents.
Sponsors
Rep. Alyce Clarke [D] | Rep. John Hines [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-09 | Passed | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-28 | DR - TSDP: PH To JB | |
2011-02-07 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Judiciary, Division B | |
2011-02-07 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-02 | Passed | |
2011-02-02 | Amendment Failed | |
2011-02-02 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-24 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-06 | Referred To Juvenile Justice |