MS HB419 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration To Establish A Program For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To Assist Certain Museums In Paying Certain Costs And Providing Funds To Destination Marketing Organizations To Assist In Paying Costs Of Certain Marketing Activities; To Define The Terms "destination Marketing Organization" And "marketing Activities" For The Purposes Of This Act; To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration To Establish A Program For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To Narratrip Llc, To Use To Assist Municipalities In The State In Paying Costs To Participate In And Be Promoted As Part Of The Business's Mobile Apps Geared Toward Promoting Tourism In The State; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tourism; provide assistance to destination marketing organizations and other entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 99 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 99 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-28 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-28 | House | Reconsidered |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Chassaniol,Hopson,Boyd |
2023-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Currie,Barton,Oliver |
2023-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: AP To TO |
2023-02-21 | Senate | DR - TSDP: TO To AP |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Tourism;Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-06 | House | Amended |
2023-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-31 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TO |
2023-01-25 | House | DR - TSDP: TO To AP |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred To Tourism;Appropriations |