MS HB419 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 41-7-171, 41-7-173, 41-7-175, 41-7-183, 41-7-185, 41-7-187, 41-7-188, 41-7-189, 41-7-190, 41-7-191, 41-7-193, 41-7-195, 41-7-197, 41-7-201, 41-7-202, 41-7-205, 41-7-207, 41-7-209, 23-15-625, 25-41-7, 35-1-19, 41-3-15, 41-4-18, 41-9-11, 41-9-23, 41-9-68, 41-9-209, 41-9-210, 41-71-7, 41-71-19, 41-73-5, 41-75-1, 41-75-5, 41-75-9, 41-75-25, 41-77-1, 41-77-5, 41-77-21, 41-77-23, 41-77-25, 41-95-3, 43-11-9, 43-11-19, 57-117-5, 41-9-311, 43-13-117.5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Health care certificate of need law; bring forward code sections related to.
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Zuber [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2024-03-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-03-13 | House | Amended |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-05 | House | DR - TSDPAA: SA To PH |
2024-03-05 | House | DR - TSDPAA: PH To SA |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services;State Affairs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 15 | 625 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 41 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 1 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 4 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 171 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 173 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 175 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 183 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 187 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 188 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 189 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 190 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 191 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 193 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 197 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 207 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 209 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 71 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 71 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 73 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 75 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 75 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 75 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 75 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 77 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 77 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 77 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 77 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 77 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 209 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 68 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 95 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 11 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 11 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 117 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |