MS HB415 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-3-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House No. 1063, 2020 Regular Session, To Authorize The Mississippi Cooperative Extension Service, Rather Than The International Association Of Assessing Officers, To Issue Certificates Of Educational Recognition To Tax Assessors; To Authorize County Board Of Supervisors To Pay The Salaries Of Tax Assessors And Collectors Every Two Weeks; To Amend Sections 25-3-17, 25-3-19, 25-3-29 And 25-3-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Such County Board Of Supervisors To Pay Every Two Weeks The Salaries Of County Prosecuting Attorneys, Boards Of Supervisors, County Auditors, Deputy Chancery Clerks, Sheriffs, Certain Deputy Sheriffs And Justice Court Judges; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Counties; authorize boards of supervisors to pay county employees every two weeks.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Powell [R] | Rep. Tom Weathersby [R] | Rep. Gene Newman [R] | Rep. Fred Shanks [R] |
Rep. Price Wallace [R] | Rep. Lee Yancey [R] | Rep. Jansen Owen [R] | Rep. Larry Byrd [R] |
Rep. Otis Anthony [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-24 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-23 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hill,Younger,Chism |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Byrd,Taylor,Smith |
2020-06-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To County Affairs |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred To County Affairs |