MS HB415 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That An Offender Who Has Committed A Crime Of Violence On Or After July 1, 1995, But Before July 1, 2014, May Be Paroled By The Parole Board If The Sentencing Judge Authorizes The Offender To Be Eligible For Parole Consideration After The Offender Has Served A Certain Number Of Years Of His Or Her Sentence; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Violent offenders, certain; may be paroled by Parole Board if sentencing judge authorizes parole consideration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseDied In Committee
2019-01-14HouseReferred To Corrections;Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback