MS HB414 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact Cole's Law To Prohibit Discrimination Against Recipients Of An Anatomical Gift Or Organ Transplant Based On Disability; To Define Certain Terms For The Act; To Provide Requirements For Covered Entities; To Provide For The Relief Provided By The Act; To Provide Certain Requirements Of Insurers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Anatomical gifts; prohibit discrimination against recipient based on disability.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Yancey [R] | Rep. Brent Powell [R] | Rep. Brent Anderson [R] | Rep. Chris Brown [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |