MS HB413 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Establish A Mississippi Gospel Music Commission To Develop A Plan To Promote Authentic Mississippi "gospel" Music And "gospel Music Culture" For Purposes Of Economic Development; To Prescribe The Functions And Duties Of The Commission; To Empower The Commission To Accept And Expend Grant Funds; To Provide For Interdepartmental Cooperation; To Authorize And Direct The Division Of Tourism Of The Mississippi Development Authority To Establish A Statewide Mississippi "gospel Music Trail" Infrastructure To Offer To Tourists And Targeted Groups A Structured Tour Of Mississippi Gospel Music Historical Sites And Performance Venues; To Authorize The Division To Designate And Erect Appropriate "mississippi Gospel Music Trail" Historical Markers; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Gospel Music Trail; authorize MDA Division of Tourism to establish program and historical markers for.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateDied In Committee
2021-03-01SenateDR - TSDP: TO To AP
2021-02-18SenateReferred To Tourism;Appropriations
2021-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-10HousePassed
2021-02-10HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Tourism

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback