MS HB412 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Sell And Convey All Or Any Portion Of Certain State-owned Real Property, And Any Improvements Thereon, Located In The City Of Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi, Known As The "old Capitol Green" Upon Which Hal And Mal's Is Located; To Amend Section 29-1-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide The Purposes For Which Lease And Rental Monies Deposited In The State Land Acquisition Fund May Be Used; And For Related Purposes.
Title
DFA; authorize to sell or lease certain state-owned real property in the City of Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Conferees Named Blount,Doty,Jackson (11th) |
2015-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Weathersby,Coleman (65th),Bounds |
2015-03-12 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Public Property |
2015-01-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-01-22 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-01-22 | House | Amended |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Public Property |