MS HB411 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 75-67-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add The Phrase "transactional Information" To The List Of Definitions In The "mississippi Pawnshop Act"; To Amend Section 75-67-309, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify When Transactional Information Is Important; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pawnbroker tranactions; clarify items to be included in "transactional information."
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Zuber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |