MS HB4086 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Joseph Greer Of Hinds County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Suffrage; restore to Joseph Greer of Hinds County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2024-04-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-26 | House | Passed |
2024-04-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |