MS HB407 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Reverse Auction Method For Receiving Bids To Differentiate Between Agencies And Governing Authorities; To Provide That If An Agency Determines That A Reverse Auction Is Not In The Best Interest Of The Agency, Then That Determination Must Be Approved By The Public Procurement Review Board; To Provide That If A Governing Authority Determines That A Reverse Auction Is Not In The Best Interest Of The Governing Authority, Then That Determination Must Be Approved By The Governing Board Of The Governing Authority; To Provide That The Agency And Governing Authority Must Submit An Explanation As To Why A Reverse Auction Is Not In The Best Interest Of The Agency Or Governing Authority; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Reverse auction; revise method of receiving bids through for agencies and governing authorities.
Sponsors
Rep. Donnie Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-03-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Turner, Rushing, Tullos) |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-25 | House | DR - TSDP: CA To MU |
2020-02-18 | House | DR - TSDP: MU To CA |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred To Municipalities;County Affairs |