MS HB396 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on February 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on February 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-5-66, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Fee-in-lieu Of Ad Valorem Taxes That Private Entities May Be Subject To When Leasing Penitentiary Lands For Agricultural Purposes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Prison lands leased for agricultural purposes; revise fee-in-lieu of ad valorem taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2015-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-28 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To CN |
2015-01-21 | House | DR - TSDP: CN To WM |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Corrections;Ways and Means |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2015/pdf/history/HB/HB0396.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2015/html/HB/0300-0399/HB0396IN.htm |