MS HB392 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 21-3-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Municipality With A Population Of 10,000 Or More, During A Certain Time Period, To Elect Five Aldermen Rather Than Seven Aldermen; To Require That The Governing Authorities Of The Municipality To Adopt A Resolution Declaring Their Intention To Increase The Number Of Aldermen And Publish The Resolution In A Newspaper Published In The Municipality; To Provide That If 10% Or 1,500, Whichever Is Less, Of The Qualified Electors Of The Municipality File A Petition Protesting The Increase In The Number Of Aldermen, The Governing Authorities Shall Call An Election Regarding Such Increase; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipalities; authorize to elect 5 aldermen if population is 10,000 or more and certain conditions are met.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
2018-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed |
2018-01-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred To Municipalities |