MS HB391 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Department Of Revenue To Consider And Enter Into Agreements With Taxpayers For The Settlement Or Compromise Of Tax Liabilities; To Bring Forward Sections 31-19-27 And 31-19-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Compromise Of Doubtful Claims, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Revenue; authorize to compromise and settle tax liabilities with taxpayers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2016-02-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed |
2016-02-11 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |