MS HB384 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-83, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Any County, Municipality, Tribe Or Other Political Subdivision Of The State That Is Wet Under The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law To Authorize Permitted Package Retailers To Engage In Package Retail Sales During Certain Hours On Sunday; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; authorize local authorities of wet jurisdiction to permit package retail sales on Sunday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 72 N: 39 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2023-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-01 | House | Passed |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |