MS HB384 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-1037, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reapportion The Congressional Districts Of Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Congressional district; reapportion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-01-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Amendment Failed |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2022-01-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-01-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-01-07 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Johnson, Roberson, Currie) |
2022-01-06 | House | Passed |
2022-01-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred To Rules |