MS HB382 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A Task Force To Study The Impact Of Immigrants On Poverty In Mississippi; To Set Forth The Duties And Purposes Of The Task Force; To Provide The Membership Of The Task Force; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Poverty; create task force to study impact of immigrants on poverty in Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-11 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Public Health and Welfare | |
2011-02-10 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-02-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Select Committee on Poverty |