MS HB380 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize A Municipality To Enter Into An Interlocal Agreement With A Rural Water Association Operating Within The Corporate Limits Of The Municipality That Requires The Association To Terminate The Water Service Of Customers Who Are Delinquent In The Payment Of Charges For Sewer Services Provided By The Municipality; To Amend Section 21-27-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipalities; authorize to enter into interlocal agreement with rural water association regarding sewer services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Municipalities |
2018-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed |
2018-01-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred To Municipalities |