MS HB372 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Transfer And Convey By Mode Of Donation To The United States Forest Service All Of The Rights, Title And Interest In Certain Real Property Located In Perry County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Transportation Commission; authorize to donate real property in Perry County, Mississippi, to U.S. Forest Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-28 | Senate | DR - TSDP: HI To PP |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation;Public Property |
2013-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed |
2013-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Public Property |