MS HB370 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-15-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Bail Bond Of A Defendant/offender Is Released When The Judge Approves Admission To The Intervention Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bail bond; require release when judge approves participation in intervention program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2022-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed |
2022-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |