MS HB368 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Designate A Certain Bridge On Highway 82 In Washington County As The Jesse Brent Memorial Bridge; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jesse Brent Memorial Bridge; designate portion of Highway 82 bridge in Washington County as.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2013-02-15SenateReferred To Highways and Transportation
2013-02-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2013-02-14HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2013-02-13HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Johnson, Massengill)
2013-02-13HousePassed
2013-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2013-01-18HouseReferred To Transportation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback