MS HB368 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - Due From Governor 04/16/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 49-15-315, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Restrictions For Commercial Harvesting Of Oysters; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oysters; revise restrictions for commercial harvesting of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-10 Due From Governor 04/16/12
2012-04-10 Enrolled Bill Signed
2012-04-10 Enrolled Bill Signed
2012-04-05 Transmitted To House
2012-04-04 Passed
2012-03-29 Title Suff Do Pass
2012-03-16 Referred To Ports and Marine Resources
2012-03-09 Transmitted To Senate
2012-03-08 Passed
2012-02-29 Title Suff Do Pass
2012-02-13 Referred To Marine Resources

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback