MS HB366 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-15-1)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Mississippi Broadband Enabling Act; To Provide Definitions For The Act; To Provide For Ownership And/or Operation Of Broadband Systems By Electric Cooperatives Through Affiliates Or Operators; To Require Electric Cooperatives To Charge Or Pay Any Entity The Same Amount Of Fees That It Charges Or Pays An Affiliate For Pole Attachment Fees Or Other Items; To Require An Electric Cooperative To Conduct An Economic Feasibility Study Before Broadband Services May Be Provided; To Require That Electric Cooperatives Maintain The Reliability Of Their Electric Systems; To Regulate Easements Under This Act; To Require An Annual Compliance Audit; To Amend Sections 77-5-205 And 77-5-231, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Broadband Enabling Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30 Approved by Governor
2019-01-24SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-01-24HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-01-24SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-01-23SenatePassed
2019-01-22SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Energy
2019-01-17HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-01-16HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-01-15HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Beckett, Steverson)
2019-01-15HousePassed As Amended
2019-01-15HouseAmended
2019-01-14HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-14HouseReferred To Public Utilities

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/HB/HB0366.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0300-0399/HB0366IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0300-0399/HB0366PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0300-0399/HB0366SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB0366_H_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB0366_H_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB0366_H_Amend_03.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB0366_H_Amend_04.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB0366_H_Amend_05.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB0366_S_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB0366_S_Amend_02.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0080004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0160003.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback