MS HB361 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-1-87, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Mississippi Ethics Commission's Authority To Operate Unmarked Vehicles; To Allow The Governor To Authorize The Executive Director Of The Mississippi Department Of Marine Resources To Use Specified Unmarked Vehicles Only In Those Instances Where Identifying Marks Will Hinder Official Investigations; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Ethics Commission; clarify authority to operate unmarked vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Turner [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. Casey Eure [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 103 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 101 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 101 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2017-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-09 | House | Amended |
2017-02-09 | House | Reconsidered |
2017-02-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Guice, Turner, Foster) |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed |
2017-02-01 | House | Amendment Failed |
2017-01-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |