MS HB359 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 85-7-251, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Five-day Requirement That A Towed Vehicle Be Left Without The Real Property Owner's Permission Before The Vehicle Owner Shall Be Liable For The Reasonable Price Of Towing And Storage Of The Vehicle; To Amend Section 63-17-74, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add An Exception To The Provision That Makes It Unlawful For A Person To Sell A Motor Vehicle That Is Not Titled And Registered In Such Person's Name For A Wrecker Service Or Automobile Repair Service/business Selling A Motor Vehicle That Is Legally Being Held For Sale As Merchandise; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; delete five-day requirement regarding towing and storage of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-26 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,Fillingane,Hill |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Busby,Smith,Clark |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2020-03-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed |
2020-03-10 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred To Transportation |