MS HB358 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-39-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase From $50,000.00 To $100,000.00 The Amount Of Bond That Is Required For The Purchasing Agent Of Any School Board; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonding requirement for school purchasing agents; increase.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateDied In Committee
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Education
2021-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-04HousePassed
2021-01-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
373921Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback