MS HB349 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require The State Department Of Education To Conduct Meetings In Each School District At Least Once A Year To Provide The Local Public With Update Of New Laws, Regulations And Policies Impacting The Field Of Education; To Require The State Superintendent Of Public Education To Appoint A Committee Of Department Employees Responsible For Being Well Informed Of Legislative Changes And Board Policy That Will Facilitate These Public Informational Sessions Throughout The State; To Require The Department To Conduct Such Meetings From The Date Of Sine Die Of The Mississippi Legislature Through December 31 Of Each Year, With The First Of Such Meetings To Be Held Not Later Than July 1; To Require The Department To Coordinate Its Meeting Schedule With Each School District; To Bring Forward Section 37-3-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendments; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Dept. of Education; require to conduct annual legislative and board update information sessions in each school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Died On Calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2012-03-13 | Read the Third Time | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-03-06 | DR - TSDPCS: AP To ED | |
2012-03-01 | DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP | |
2012-02-13 | Referred To Education;Appropriations |