MS HB349 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 69-10-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Repealer On The Law Providing For The Assessment On Rice Grown In The State Of Mississippi And The Records And Reporting Requirements Of The Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Commerce For The Mississippi Rice Promotion Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Rice Promotion Fund; delete the repealer on.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-01-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-01-28 | Referred To Agriculture | |
2011-01-28 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-26 | Passed | |
2011-01-26 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-18 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Agriculture |