MS HB346 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-15-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Liability Insurance Required Under The Mississippi Motor Vehicle Safety-responsibility Law May Contain Exclusions And Limitations On Coverage As Long As The Exclusions And Limitations Language Or Form Has Been Filed With And Approved By The Commissioner Of Insurance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Motor Vehicle Safety-Responsibility Law; allow certain exclusions and limitations on liability insurance required under.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] | Rep. Nick Bain [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 70 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 70 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2015-01-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-01-20 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-01-20 | House | Amended |
2015-01-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred To Insurance |