MS HB340 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-85-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Provision That Establishes A Moratorium On Processing New Applications For Hospice Licensure Until All Current Licenses And Their Branches Have Been Surveyed, With Certain Exceptions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hospice licensure; extend repealer on moratorium on processing new applications for licensure.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-09 | Passed | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-20 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2011-01-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-19 | Passed | |
2011-01-18 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |