MS HB334 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 9-27-1 Through 9-27-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Rivers Mcgraw Mental Health Diversion Pilot Program Act To Be The Rivers Mcgraw Mental Health Court Act And Allow Mental Health Courts To Be Established Throughout The State; To Create New Section 9-27-6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Administrative Office Of Courts Shall Be Responsible For Certification And Monitoring Of Local Mental Health Courts; To Establish The State Mental Health Courts Advisory Committee; To Create New Section 9-27-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Establish The Mental Health Court Fund; To Amend Section 43-21-357, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Youth Court Intake Unit To Recommend That A Child Be Referred To The Youth Court Mental Health Court And To Allow The Youth Court The Option To Order That A Child Be Referred To The Youth Court Mental Health Court; To Amend Section 25-3-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify Duties Imposed On Supreme Court Justices, Chancery Court Judges And Circuit Court Judges Relating To Mental Health Courts; To Repeal Section 9-27-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes Certain Circuit Court Districts To Establish Mental Health Diversion Pilot Programs; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health courts; authorize to be established throughout the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-07HousePassed
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-14HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback