MS HB333 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 11-1-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Designers In The Provisions Regarding Conditions For Liability For Products Liability; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Products liability; revise to include designers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 110 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Allow Governor's Veto to Stand |
2013-03-21 | House | Veto Referred To Judiciary A |
2013-03-20 | Vetoed | |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-11 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2013-02-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed |
2013-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-14 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |