MS HB33 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-805, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That All Campaign Finance Statements, Reports Of Contributions And Expenditures, And Other Reports Required To Be Filed Shall Be Posted Online By The Secretary Of State; To Amend Section 23-15-815, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Campaign finance reports; require those filed by all candidates to be available online.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Elections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-04 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 15 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |