MS HB325 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authority Of The City Of Columbus, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax On Retail Sales Of Beer, Alcoholic Beverages And Prepared Food Sold By Restaurants Within The City For The Purpose Of Funding The Columbus-lowndes Convention And Visitor's Bureau, The Promotion Of Community And Economic Development By The Golden Triangle Development Link, City And County Parks And Recreational Activities And Improvements, And Other Community Development And Tourism-related Events And Activities; To Amend Chapter 953, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, To Revise The Composition Of The Lowndes Convention And Visitor's Bureau; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Columbus and Lowndes County; authorize restaurant tax to fund Columbus-Lowndes Convention and Visitor's Bureau and revise composition of bureau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-02-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2019-01-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-01-21 | House | Passed |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |