MS HB325 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 63-15-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Penalties For The Crime Of Failure To Have An Insurance Card; To Amend Section 63-16-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Monies In Excess Of The Amount Needed To Defray The Expenses And Costs Of The Verification System Remaining In The Uninsured Motorist Identification Fund At The End Of A Fiscal Year Shall Be Transferred To A Special Fund Created In The State Treasury For The Purpose Of Funding A Highway Patrol Trooper School; To Change The Violation From A Civil Violation To A Criminal Offense For Failure To Have Mandatory Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance; To Amend Section 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create State Assessments For The Uninsured Motorist Identification Fund; To Bring Forward Section 63-16-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MS Vehicle Insurance Verification System; revise various laws regarding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 94 N: 12 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13 Approved by Governor
2018-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-26SenateConference Report Adopted
2018-03-26HouseConference Report Adopted
2018-03-25HouseConference Report Filed
2018-03-25SenateConference Report Filed
2018-03-24SenateConferees Named Carmichael,Simmons (12th),Michel
2018-03-19HouseConferees Named Chism,Touchstone,Bell (65th)
2018-03-13HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2018-03-07SenateReturned For Concurrence
2018-03-06SenatePassed As Amended
2018-03-06SenateAmended
2018-02-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-02-21SenateDR - TSDP: IN To AP
2018-02-09SenateReferred To Insurance;Appropriations
2018-01-26HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-01-24HousePassed As Amended
2018-01-24HouseAmended
2018-01-24HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2018-01-09HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2018-01-03HouseReferred To Insurance

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/history/HB/HB0325.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/0300-0399/HB0325IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/0300-0399/HB0325CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/0300-0399/HB0325PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/0300-0399/HB0325SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/ham/HB0325_H_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB0325_S_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/house/0230003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/senate/0640023.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/house/0840017.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/senate/0840027.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback