MS HB324 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require Insurance Companies To File A Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure (cgad) With The Commissioner Of Insurance; To Define Certain Terms; To Authorize The Commissioner Of Insurance To Issue Rules, Regulations And Orders As Necessary To Carry Out The Provisions Of This Act; To Provide For The Contents Of Corporate Governance Annual Disclosures; To Provide That Certain Documents, Materials Or Other Cgad-related Information Shall Be Confidential And Shall Not Be Subject To The Mississippi Public Records Act; To Authorize The Commissioner To Retain Third-party Consultants; To Provide A Penalty For Failing To Timely File The Disclosure As Required By This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Insurance companies; require to file a corporate governance annual disclosure with the Commissioner of Insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-11 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-03-04 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: IN To AC |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Insurance;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2019-01-30 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-01-29 | House | Passed |
2019-01-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred To Insurance |