MS HB323 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-5-102, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions Of Certain Terms Used In The Sections Of Law Requiring An Audit Of Insurers; To Amend Section 83-5-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Audit Committee Of An Insurer Shall Be Responsible For Overseeing The Insurer's Internal Audit Function; To Create Section 83-5-120, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Insurers To Establish An Internal Audit Function Providing Independent, Objective And Reasonable Assurance To The Audit Committee And Insurer Management Regarding The Insurer's Governance, Risk Management And Internal Controls; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Insurance companies; require to establish an internal audit function.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-04 | Senate | DR - TSDP: IN To AC |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Insurance;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2019-01-30 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-01-29 | House | Passed |
2019-01-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred To Insurance |