MS HB322 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-23-109, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of Covered Claim Under The Mississippi Insurance Guaranty Association Law; To Amend Section 83-23-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Further Provide What A Covered Claim Shall Not Include; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Insurance Guaranty Association Law; revise definition of covered claim under.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2019-01-30 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-01-29 | House | Passed |
2019-01-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred To Insurance |