MS HB32 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 37-9-13, 37-9-25, 37-5-61, 37-5-71, And 37-5-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Appointment Of The Superintendent In School Districts With An Elected Superintendent Of Schools In The Event A Vacancy In Office Occurs Before January 1, 2019; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School superintendents; require appointment of in the event of vacancy in elected office of before January 1, 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. John Moore [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2017-01-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-01-04 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-01-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-01-04 | House | Amended |
2017-01-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred To Education |