MS HB319 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Reenacted Section 63-16-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance Coverage In At Least The Minimum Amounts Required By Law Before A Motor Vehicle Owner May Renew A Registration; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor vehicle liability insurance; require to renew registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Insurance;Appropriations |
2017-01-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-01-11 | House | Passed |
2017-01-11 | House | Amendment Failed |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-10 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred To Insurance |