MS HB312 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 69-7-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Abolish The Central Market Board And Transfer Its Functions And Responsibilities To The Department Of Agriculture And Commerce; To Amend Section 69-7-109, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Transfer Powers Of Duties Of The Central Market Board To The Department Of Agriculture And Commerce; To Amend Section 69-7-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Transfer Record-keeping Responsibilities From The State Market To The Department Of Agriculture And Commerce; To Amend Section 69-7-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Transfer Authority Of The Central Market Board For The Acquisition Of Facilities To The Department Of Agriculture; To Amend Section 69-7-121, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Transfer Authority Over The Central Market Fund From The Central Market Board To The Department Of Agriculture; To Repeal Sections 69-7-103, 69-7-105, 69-7-107, 69-7-111, 69-7-117 And 69-7-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Central Market Board; abolish and transfer functions of to the Mississippi Department of Agriculture and Commerce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2021-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Agriculture |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 7 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 7 | 103 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 7 | 105 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 7 | 107 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 7 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 7 | 111 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 7 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 7 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 7 | 117 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 7 | 119 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 7 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |