MS HB297 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 25-53-1, 25-53-3, 25-53-5, 25-53-7, 25-53-9, 25-53-11, 25-53-13, 25-53-15, 25-53-17, 25-53-19, 25-53-21, 25-53-23, 25-53-25, 25-53-29, 25-53-51, 25-53-53, 25-53-55, 25-53-57, 25-53-59, 25-53-101, 25-53-105, 25-53-107, 25-53-109, 25-53-111, 25-53-113, 25-53-115, 25-53-117, 25-53-119, 25-53-121, 25-53-123, 25-53-125, 25-53-151, 25-53-171, 25-53-191, 25-53-193, 25-53-201, 25-58-1, 25-58-3, 41-143-1, 1-1-59, 7-1-403, 7-7-3, 19-5-307, 23-15-165, 25-1-100, 25-58-21, 25-65-5, 25-65-7, 27-7-83, 27-65-81, 27-104-7, 27-104-165, 27-104-205, 27-115-49, 31-7-10, 31-7-13, 37-101-413, 37-154-1, 43-1-28, 43-19-45, 45-27-7, 49-37-7, 57-13-23, 63-9-31, 63-21-18, 73-34-8, 75-12-33 And 89-5-109, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Mississippi Department Of Information Technology Services, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Department of Information Technology Services; bring forward code sections related to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2024-04-25 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Williams,DeLano,Parker |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Zuber,Shanks,Ford (73rd) |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Technology |
2024-03-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Passed |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-29 | House | DR - TSDP: TE To SA |
2024-02-27 | House | DR - TSDP: SA To TE |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred To State Affairs;Technology |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 1 | 59 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 307 | New Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 165 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 119 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 123 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 125 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 151 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 171 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 191 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 193 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 59 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 53 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 58 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 58 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 58 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 65 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 65 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 104 | 165 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 104 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 104 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 115 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 65 | 81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 7 | 83 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 7 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 7 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 101 | 413 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 154 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 143 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 1 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 19 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 27 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 37 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 13 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 21 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 9 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 1 | 403 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 7 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 34 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 12 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
89 | 5 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |