MS HB274 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-106-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Provisions Of The Higher Education Learning Plan Grant Program To Align The Curriculum Requirements With Changes In The College Preparatory Curriculum Required By The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning By Removing The Specific Number Of Units Required For Admission To A State University; And For Related Purposes.
Title
HELP Grant Program; align curriculum with changes for college preparatory as required by IHL.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred To Education |