MS HB273 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-32-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Authority Of A County Public Defender Over The Employees Of The County Public Defender's Office Regardless Of The Source Of Funding For The Office; To Repeal Section 25-32-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Repeal Of Sections 25-32-1 Through 25-32-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Upon Implementation Of The Now-defunct Statewide Public Defender System; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public defenders; clarify authority over employees of the office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2014-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed |
2014-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |