MS HB271 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Additional Appropriation To The Department Of Health For The Purpose Of Funding The Mississippi Hospital Sustainability Grant Program Established Under Senate Bill No. 2372, 2023 Regular Session, For The Period Beginning Upon The Passage Of This Act And Ending June 30, 2024.
Title
Appropriation; additional to Health Department for Mississippi Hospital Sustainability Grant Program, ARPA funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-26 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-26 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Read,Mims,White |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Blackwell,Polk |
2023-03-15 | House | Conferees Named Read,Mims,Bounds |
2023-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2023-02-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-02-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-06 | House | Referred To Appropriations |